Texas – Henderson – Athens
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
www.fnbathens.com
Texas
Henderson
Athens
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
3080
1890
FDIC Certificate Number: 3080
FDIC's unique number: 1961
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 263953
Report Date: 2005-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 4278
The date of the last data update: 2005-05-20
1890-04-17 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Athens.
1990-06-08 Acquired First State Bank in Eustace, Texas.
1992-09-30 Acquired First National Bank Of Gun Barrel City in Gun Barrel City, Texas.
2005-05-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Franklin Bank, S.S.B. in Houston, Texas.
2005-06-23 Moved bank headquarters from Athens, Texas to Houston, Texas.
2005-07-15 Acquired Elgin Bank Of Texas in Elgin, Texas.
2007-05-08 Changed trust powers from Trust Powers Not Granted to Full Trust Powers Granted.
2007-05-08 Acquired The First National Bank Of Bryan in Bryan, Texas.
2008-11-07 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Prosperity Bank in El Campo, Texas.
2008-11-07 FDIC closing information for
Franklin Bank, S.S.B. : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/franklinbank.html.
Total assets: $212,665,000
Total deposits: $185,051,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First National Bank of Athens does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Athens, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Athens will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-13431