The First National Bank of Audrain County

Missouri – Audrain – Mexico

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

active

Claim your profile

Rate now

  [ 0.00 ] – not rated yet Voters 0   Comments 0

Details

Bank class

(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member

Status

active

FDIC number

4551

Established

1883

Other info

FDIC Certificate Number: 4551
FDIC's unique number: 3012
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbia Mo

Federal Reserve ID Number: 934954
Report Date: 2011-06-30

Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 2881

Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03

History

1883-01-03 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Mexico.
1994-10-01 Acquired Laddonia State Bank in Mexico, Missouri.
1994-10-01 Changed name to The First National Bank Of Audrain County .

Financial data

Total assets: $155,073,000
Total deposits: $117,126,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $117,126,000
Equity capital: $12,371,000

Net income: $974,000

Return on Assets: 1.3
Return on Equity: 16.17
Last updated on: 2011-10-20

Biography

Bank Holding Company: Central Bancompany

No associations

LandOfFree

Say what you really think

Search LandOfFree.com for USA banks and branches. Rate them and share your experience with other people.

Rating

The First National Bank of Audrain County does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.

If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Audrain County, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Audrain County will most certainly appreciate the feedback.

Rate now

     

Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2445

  Search
All data on this website is collected from public sources. Our data reflects the most accurate information available at the time of publication.