Pennsylvania – Luzerne – Pittston
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Pennsylvania
Luzerne
Pittston
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
7387
1907
FDIC Certificate Number: 7387
FDIC's unique number: 4820
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Philadelphia
Federal Reserve ID Number: 52915
Report Date: 1987-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 8494
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1907-04-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Avoca.
1987-11-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Northeastern Bank of Pennsylvania in Wilkes Barre, Pennsylvania.
1988-12-30 Acquired The First National Bank Of Peckville in Peckville, Pennsylvania.
1993-02-08 Changed name to Pnc Bank, Northeast Pa .
1993-06-26 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
1993-08-06 Acquired The First Bank And Trust Company Of Mechanicsburg, Pa. in Mechanicsburg, Pennsylvania.
1993-08-06 Acquired The Hershey Bank in Hershey, Pennsylvania.
1993-08-06 Acquired Ccnb Bank, National Association in Camp Hill, Pennsylvania.
1994-01-21 Acquired United Federal Savings Bank in State College, Pennsylvania.
1994-06-17 Acquired First Eastern Bank, National Association in Wilkes-barre, Pennsylvania.
1995-10-06 Acquired Pnc Bank, New Jersey, National Association in Philadelphia, Pennsylvania.
1996-09-06 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
1997-11-30 Acquired Pnc Mortgage Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
1997-12-01 Acquired Pnc Bank New York, National Association in Warren, Pennsylvania.
1997-12-31 Acquired Pnc Bank, Ohio, National Association in Cincinnati, Ohio.
1997-12-31 Acquired Pnc Bank, Kentucky, Inc. in Louisville, Kentucky.
1997-12-31 Acquired P N C Bank, Indiana, Inc. in New Albany, Indiana.
2000-11-30 Acquired Pnc Converted Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2001-03-31 Acquired Pnc Advisors, National Association in Boston, Massachusetts.
2001-09-30 Acquired Hilliard Lyons Trust Company in Louisville, Kentucky.
2004-03-19 Acquired United Trust Bank in Bridgewater, New Jersey.
2005-05-13 Acquired Riggs National Trust Company in Mclean, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Farmers & Mechanics Bank in Frederick, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired The Citizens National Bank in Laurel, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Eastern Shore Bank in Chestertown, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired The National Bank Of Fredericksburg in Fredericksburg, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Marshall National Bank And Trust Company in Marshall, Virginia.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Peninsula Bank in Selbyville, Delaware.
2007-09-14 Acquired The Annapolis Banking And Trust Company in Annapolis, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Westminster Union Bank in Westminster, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile County Bank in Elkton, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile Southern Maryland Bank in Leonardtown, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Acquired Mercantile-safe Deposit And Trust Company in Baltimore, Maryland.
2008-03-07 Acquired The Yardville National Bank in Yardville, New Jersey.
2008-08-08 Acquired Blc Bank N. A. in Strasburg, Pennsylvania.
2009-08-14 Acquired Dwelling House Savings And Loan Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-21 Moved bank headquarters from Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania to Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-08-21 Acquired Pnc Bank, Delaware in Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-11-06 Acquired National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
Total assets: $50,779,000
Total deposits: $43,909,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First National Bank of Avoca does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Avoca, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Avoca will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23800