Kentucky – Carroll – Carrollton
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.fnbcarrollton.com
Kentucky
Carroll
Carrollton
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
2735
1881
FDIC Certificate Number: 2735
FDIC's unique number: 1775
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 907444
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 2592
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1881-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Carrollton.
1999-01-01 Reorganized.
Total assets: $94,982,000
Total deposits: $83,607,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $83,607,000
Equity capital: $10,153,000
Net income: $568,000
Return on Assets: 1.2
Return on Equity: 11
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Port William Bancshares, Inc.
The First National Bank Of Carrollton - Highway 227 Branch
The First National Bank Of Carrollton - The First National Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
The First National Bank of Carrollton does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Carrollton, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Carrollton will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17505