Vermont – Rutland – Fair Haven
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Vermont
Rutland
Fair Haven
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
6272
1864
FDIC Certificate Number: 6272
FDIC's unique number: 4236
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Ma
Federal Reserve ID Number: 171209
Report Date: 1974-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 344
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1864-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Fair Haven.
1974-12-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First National Bank of Springfield in Springfield, Vermont.
1976-06-30 Acquired The Merchants National Bank Of St. Johnsbury in St. Johnsbury, Vermont.
1980-04-30 Changed name to First National Bank Of Vermont .
1992-07-01 Moved bank headquarters from Springfield, Vermont to Bradford, Vermont.
1992-07-01 Acquired The Bradford National Bank in Bradford, Vermont.
1992-07-01 Acquired The Caledonia National Bank Of Danville in Danville, Vermont.
1993-01-29 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of New First National Bank of Vermont, National Association in Bradford, Vermont.
1993-06-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Merchants Bank in Burlington, Vermont.
1996-05-24 Moved bank headquarters from Bradford, Vermont to Burlington, Vermont.
Total assets: $6,157,000
Total deposits: $5,645,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First National Bank of Fair Haven does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Fair Haven, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Fair Haven will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-7710