South Dakota – Hutchinson – Freeman
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
South Dakota
Hutchinson
Freeman
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
3986
1902
FDIC Certificate Number: 3986
FDIC's unique number: 2591
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Sioux Falls
Federal Reserve ID Number: 405753
Report Date: 2000-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 6181
The date of the last data update: 2000-10-20
1902-05-02 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Freeman.
2000-09-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of CorTrust Bank National Association in Mitchell, South Dakota.
2009-09-11 Acquired Brickwell Community Bank in Woodbury, Minnesota as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $48,078,000
Total deposits: $43,071,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First National Bank of Freeman does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Freeman, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Freeman will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-25736