Illinois – McHenry – Marengo
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Illinois
McHenry
Marengo
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
22330
1976
FDIC Certificate Number: 22330
FDIC's unique number: 15539
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Chicago
Federal Reserve ID Number: 421838
Report Date: 2007-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 16601
The date of the last data update: 2007-11-19
1976-09-07 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank Of Marengo.
1991-06-24 Reorganized.
1991-06-24 Changed name to The First National Bank Of Marengo .
2007-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Castle Bank, National Association in Dekalb, Illinois.
2010-09-29 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank of Omaha in Omaha, Nebraska.
Total assets: $355,084,000
Total deposits: $268,121,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First National Bank of Marengo does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Marengo, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Marengo will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4869