Texas
Young
Olney
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
3372
1907
FDIC Certificate Number: 3372
FDIC's unique number: 2190
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 828361
Report Date: 1986-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 8982
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1907-10-21 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Olney.
1987-03-12 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank of Olney in Olney, Texas.
2010-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of InterBank in Oklahoma City, Oklahoma.
2011-06-14 Acquired First National Bank Of Borger in Panhandle, Texas.
Total assets: $16,684,000
Total deposits: $17,340,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First National Bank of Olney does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Olney, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Olney will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-18789