Alabama – Lee – Opelika
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Alabama
Lee
Opelika
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
2819
1886
FDIC Certificate Number: 2819
FDIC's unique number: 1841
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Montgomery
Federal Reserve ID Number: 426431
Report Date: 1998-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 3452
The date of the last data update: 1999-02-05
1886-01-16 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Opelika.
1988-08-09 Reorganized.
1998-12-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of BancorpSouth Bank in Tupelo, Mississippi.
1999-02-27 Acquired The Home Bank in Guntersville, Alabama.
2000-09-01 Acquired The Bank Of North Arkansas in Melbourne, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired The First National Bank Of El Dorado in El Dorado, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired The City National Bank Of Fort Smith in Fort Smith, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired The Citizens National Bank Of Hope in Hope, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired First United Bank in Stuttgart, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired Merchants And Planters Bank, National Association in Camden, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired First National Bank Of Magnolia in Magnolia, Arkansas.
2000-09-01 Acquired First Republic Bank in Monroe, Louisiana.
2000-09-01 Acquired Firstbank in Texarkana, Texas.
2000-09-01 Acquired Fredonia State Bank in Nacogdoches, Texas.
2000-09-01 Acquired City Bank & Trust Of Shreveport, Louisiana in Shreveport, Louisiana.
2000-09-01 Acquired First United Trust Company, National Association in El Dorado, Arkansas.
2000-10-31 Acquired First Federal Savings And Loan Association in Texarkana, Arkansas.
2002-02-28 Acquired Pinnacle Bank in Little Rock, Arkansas.
2004-12-31 Acquired Premier Bank Of Brentwood in Brentwood, Tennessee.
2004-12-31 Acquired The Business Bank in Baton Rouge, Louisiana.
2005-12-01 Acquired American State Bank in Jonesboro, Arkansas.
2006-09-01 Acquired First Kensington Bank in Tampa, Florida.
2007-07-02 Acquired The Signature Bank in Springfield, Missouri.
Total assets: $143,391,000
Total deposits: $121,580,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First National Bank of Opelika does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Opelika, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Opelika will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3415