Texas – Fisher – Rotan
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Texas
Fisher
Rotan
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
5501
1907
FDIC Certificate Number: 5501
FDIC's unique number: 3731
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lubbock
Federal Reserve ID Number: 990062
Report Date: 1997-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 8693
The date of the last data update: 1997-04-17
1907-05-17 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Rotan.
1989-03-16 Acquired The Farmers & Merchants State Bank in Ballinger, Texas.
1997-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank in Rotan, Texas.
Total assets: $72,396,000
Total deposits: $64,847,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First National Bank of Rotan does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Rotan, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Rotan will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4659