Texas – Runnels – Rowena
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Texas
Runnels
Rowena
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
5502
1908
FDIC Certificate Number: 5502
FDIC's unique number: 3732
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 991667
Report Date: 1997-03-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 12408
The date of the last data update: 1997-07-09
1908-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The First National Bank Of Rowena.
1997-06-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of West Texas State Bank in Snyder, Texas.
2009-12-07 Moved bank headquarters from Rowena, Texas to Snyder, Texas.
Total assets: $12,279,000
Total deposits: $11,608,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First National Bank of Rowena does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First National Bank of Rowena, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First National Bank of Rowena will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4656