Oklahoma – Le Flore – Wister
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Oklahoma
Le Flore
Wister
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
2316
1909
FDIC Certificate Number: 2316
FDIC's unique number: 1533
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tulsa
Federal Reserve ID Number: 860558
Report Date: 2000-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 2000-08-07
1909-04-01 Institution established. Original name: First State Bank.
1974-06-30 Changed name to The First State Bank .
1999-09-24 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2000-07-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Community State Bank in Poteau, Oklahoma.
Total assets: $8,754,000
Total deposits: $6,958,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3274