Oklahoma – Le Flore – Talihina
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Oklahoma
Le Flore
Talihina
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
5998
1930
FDIC Certificate Number: 5998
FDIC's unique number: 4064
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Tulsa
Federal Reserve ID Number: 261155
Report Date: 1988-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1930-09-10 Institution established. Original name: The First State Bank In Talihina.
1988-09-22 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Spiro State Bank in Spiro, Oklahoma.
2002-06-30 Moved bank headquarters from Talihina, Oklahoma to Spiro, Oklahoma.
Total assets: $15,813,000
Total deposits: $14,744,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First State Bank in Talihina does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First State Bank in Talihina, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First State Bank in Talihina will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-21396