Kansas – Leavenworth – Lansing
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kansas
Leavenworth
Lansing
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
19616
1966
FDIC Certificate Number: 19616
FDIC's unique number: 13415
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 11752
Report Date: 1995-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1996-01-23
1966-08-01 Institution established. Original name: The First State Bank Of Lansing.
1996-01-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Citizens National Bank in Greenleaf, Kansas.
Total assets: $15,560,000
Total deposits: $13,943,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First State Bank of Lansing does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First State Bank of Lansing, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First State Bank of Lansing will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22845