Minnesota – Benton – Rice
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Minnesota
Benton
Rice
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
8836
1916
FDIC Certificate Number: 8836
FDIC's unique number: 5631
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Minneapolis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 789154
Report Date: 1979-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1916-12-21 Institution established. Original name: The First State Bank Of Rice.
1980-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The First American National Bank of St. Cloud in St. Cloud, Minnesota.
1994-01-01 Changed name to First American Bank, National Association .
1998-04-30 Reorganized.
1998-11-02 Changed name to Bremer Bank, National Association .
2005-12-12 Changed name to Bremer Bank, National Association .
2005-12-12 Moved bank headquarters from St. Cloud, Minnesota to Saint Cloud, Minnesota.
Total assets: $2,733,000
Total deposits: $2,579,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The First State Bank of Rice does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The First State Bank of Rice, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The First State Bank of Rice will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3378