Ohio – Wyandot – Harpster
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Ohio
Wyandot
Harpster
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
17234
1883
FDIC Certificate Number: 17234
FDIC's unique number: 11261
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus
Federal Reserve ID Number: 948429
Report Date: 1978-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1995-09-28
1883-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Harpster Bank.
1978-07-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Commercial Savings Bank in Upper Sandusky, Ohio.
1995-04-13 Reorganized.
Total assets: $7,557,000
Total deposits: $6,879,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Harpster Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Harpster Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Harpster Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6035