Kansas – Crawford – Hepler
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kansas
Crawford
Hepler
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
13890
1904
FDIC Certificate Number: 13890
FDIC's unique number: 8684
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 811251
Report Date: 1988-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1904-03-01 Institution established. Original name: The Hepler State Bank.
1989-03-22 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Farmers State Bank of Walnut, Kansas in Walnut, Kansas.
1989-12-31 Moved bank headquarters from Hepler, Kansas to Walnut, Kansas.
1996-10-28 Changed name to Farmers National Bank Of Kansas .
1996-10-28 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $5,006,000
Total deposits: $4,597,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Hepler State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Hepler State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Hepler State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-9003