Kansas – Brown – Hiawatha
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Kansas
Brown
Hiawatha
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
28697
1921
FDIC Certificate Number: 28697
FDIC's unique number: 41531
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Kansas City
Federal Reserve ID Number: 440277
Report Date: 1989-12-31
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1921-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Hiawatha Savings And Loan Association.
1988-04-30 Changed name to The Hiawatha Savings And Loan Association .
1990-03-09 Failed, went into receivership, and then became The Hiawatha Federal Savings Association in Hiawatha, Kansas.
1990-11-16 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The Morrill and Janes Bank and Trust Company in Hiawatha, Kansas.
1992-04-20 Acquired The Bank Of Robinson in Robinson, Kansas.
2002-11-09 Moved bank headquarters from Hiawatha, Kansas to Merriam, Kansas.
2002-11-09 Acquired The Morrill State Bank & Trust Co. in Sabetha, Kansas.
2002-11-09 Acquired First National Bank Of Onaga in Onaga, Kansas.
2007-05-24 Acquired Exchange Bank in Mound City, Missouri.
Total assets: $49,198,000
Total deposits: $54,136,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Hiawatha Savings and Loan Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Hiawatha Savings and Loan Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Hiawatha Savings and Loan Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-1659