Kansas – Crawford – Arcadia
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kansas
Crawford
Arcadia
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
13830
1908
FDIC Certificate Number: 13830
FDIC's unique number: 8644
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Springfield Mo
Federal Reserve ID Number: 606550
Report Date: 1988-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1908-03-26 Institution established. Original name: The Home State Bank.
1989-02-16 Failed. No active institution received any of its deposits or its assets.
Total assets: $1,731,000
Total deposits: $1,706,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Home State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Home State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Home State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17299