Kansas – Stafford – Hudson
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kansas
Stafford
Hudson
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
14115
1904
FDIC Certificate Number: 14115
FDIC's unique number: 8821
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hays
Federal Reserve ID Number: 753258
Report Date: 1990-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1904-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Hudson State Bank.
1990-04-02 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Security State Bank in Great Bend, Kansas.
1993-05-01 Changed name to Umb Security State Bank .
1994-07-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of UMB National Bank of America in Salina, Kansas.
Total assets: $10,632,000
Total deposits: $9,116,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Hudson State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Hudson State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Hudson State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4941