Massachusetts – Dukes – Vineyard Haven
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
Massachusetts
Dukes
Vineyard Haven
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
inactive
26603
1909
FDIC Certificate Number: 26603
FDIC's unique number: 35324
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: South Boston
Federal Reserve ID Number: 182175
Report Date: 2007-09-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
The date of the last data update: 2007-11-16
1909-01-01 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: The Martha's Vineyard Co-operative Bank Of Tisbury.
1986-03-26 Became FDIC insured.
2007-11-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Martha's Vineyard Savings Bank in Edgartown, Massachusetts.
Total assets: $166,774,000
Total deposits: $128,757,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Martha's Vineyard Co-operative Bank of Tisbury does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Martha's Vineyard Co-operative Bank of Tisbury, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Martha's Vineyard Co-operative Bank of Tisbury will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14029