Kentucky – Wayne – Monticello
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
www.bankatmbc.com
Kentucky
Wayne
Monticello
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
active
292
1895
FDIC Certificate Number: 292
FDIC's unique number: 236
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 266945
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
Number of Domestic Offices: 12
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-11-02
1895-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Monticello Banking Company.
1999-05-17 Moved bank headquarters from Monticello, Kentucky to Somerset, Kentucky.
2000-10-02 Moved bank headquarters from Somerset, Kentucky to Monticello, Kentucky.
2002-09-09 Acquired Bank Of Clinton County, Inc. in Albany, Kentucky.
2010-11-02 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
2010-11-02 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
Total assets: $602,379,000
Total deposits: $548,902,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $548,902,000
Equity capital: $52,000,000
Net income: $2,055,000
Return on Assets: 0.68
Return on Equity: 8.26
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Monticello Bankshares, Inc.
The Monticello Banking Company - Bowling Green - Heartland Branc
The Monticello Banking Company - Casey County Branch
The Monticello Banking Company - Cave Mill Road Branch
The Monticello Banking Company - Clinton County Branch
The Monticello Banking Company - Downtown Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
The Monticello Banking Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Monticello Banking Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Monticello Banking Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22494