Colorado – Montrose – Naturita
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Colorado
Montrose
Naturita
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
20746
1972
FDIC Certificate Number: 20746
FDIC's unique number: 14329
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 462859
Report Date: 1993-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-01-25
1972-07-14 Institution established. Original name: The Montrose County Bank.
1994-01-18 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Citizens State Bank of Ouray in Ouray, Colorado.
1994-01-21 Moved bank headquarters from Naturita, Colorado to Ouray, Colorado.
Total assets: $9,961,000
Total deposits: $8,951,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Montrose County Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Montrose County Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Montrose County Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24181