Pennsylvania – Erie – North East
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
www.nbne.com
Pennsylvania
Erie
North East
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
7938
1908
FDIC Certificate Number: 7938
FDIC's unique number: 5078
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Wexford
Federal Reserve ID Number: 955623
Report Date: 2005-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 9149
The date of the last data update: 2005-11-30
1908-05-28 Institution established. Original name: The National Bank Of North East.
1989-06-30 Reorganized.
2005-10-07 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First National Bank of Pennsylvania in Greenville, Pennsylvania.
2006-05-26 Acquired The Legacy Bank in Harrisburg, Pennsylvania.
2008-04-01 Acquired Omega Bank in Huntingdon, Pennsylvania.
2008-08-15 Acquired Iron And Glass Bank in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2011-01-01 Acquired Community Bank & Trust Company in Clarks Summit, Pennsylvania.
Total assets: $66,571,000
Total deposits: $59,778,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The National Bank of North East does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The National Bank of North East, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The National Bank of North East will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14416