New Hampshire – Grafton – Plymouth
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
www.pemibank.com
New Hampshire
Grafton
Plymouth
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
6247
1881
FDIC Certificate Number: 6247
FDIC's unique number: 4216
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Concord
Federal Reserve ID Number: 526706
Report Date: 2005-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 2587
The date of the last data update: 2005-10-19
1881-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Pemigewasset National Bank Of Plymouth.
1985-08-30 Reorganized.
2005-10-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Northway Bank in Berlin, New Hampshire.
Total assets: $236,122,000
Total deposits: $181,278,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Pemigewasset National Bank of Plymouth does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Pemigewasset National Bank of Plymouth, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Pemigewasset National Bank of Plymouth will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-10791