Pennsylvania – Northampton – Pen Argyl
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Pennsylvania
Northampton
Pen Argyl
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
7678
1905
FDIC Certificate Number: 7678
FDIC's unique number: 4972
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Philadelphia
Federal Reserve ID Number: 284417
Report Date: 1988-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 7710
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1905-05-18 Institution established. Original name: The Pen Argyl National Bank.
1988-12-30 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Lafayette Bank in Easton, Pennsylvania.
1991-06-03 Acquired The Second National Bank Of Nazareth in Nazareth, Pennsylvania.
1998-09-11 Changed name to Lafayette Ambassador Bank .
1998-09-11 Acquired Ambassador Bank Of The Commonwealth in Allentown, Pennsylvania.
1998-12-22 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Federal Reserve Board.
Total assets: $76,791,000
Total deposits: $64,539,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Pen Argyl National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Pen Argyl National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Pen Argyl National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17287