Kentucky – Bullitt – Shepherdsville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.pbofbc.com
Kentucky
Bullitt
Shepherdsville
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
1884
1900
FDIC Certificate Number: 1884
FDIC's unique number: 1257
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Elizabethtown
Federal Reserve ID Number: 68345
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 5
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-11-03
1900-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Peoples Bank.
1986-05-05 Changed name to The Peoples Bank Of Bullitt County .
1990-10-02 Reorganized.
Total assets: $218,026,000
Total deposits: $176,900,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $176,900,000
Equity capital: $29,879,000
Net income: $1,092,000
Return on Assets: 0.99
Return on Equity: 7.48
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Peoples Bancorp Inc. Of Bullitt County
The Peoples Bank Of Bullitt County - Buckman Street Branch
The Peoples Bank Of Bullitt County - John Harper Highway Branch
The Peoples Bank Of Bullitt County - Lebanon Junction Branch
The Peoples Bank Of Bullitt County - Mount Washington Branch
The Peoples Bank Of Bullitt County - The Peoples Bank Of Bullitt
No associations
LandOfFree
The Peoples Bank of Bullitt County does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Peoples Bank of Bullitt County, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Peoples Bank of Bullitt County will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-6389