Maryland – Caroline – Denton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.peoplesbankmd.com
Maryland
Caroline
Denton
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
9693
1898
FDIC Certificate Number: 9693
FDIC's unique number: 6201
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Baltimore
Federal Reserve ID Number: 762429
Report Date: 2004-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2004-08-25
1898-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Peoples Bank Of Maryland.
2004-07-28 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Mercantile Eastern Shore Bank in Chestertown, Maryland.
2007-09-14 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of PNC Bank, National Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania.
2008-03-07 Acquired The Yardville National Bank in Yardville, New Jersey.
2008-08-08 Acquired Blc Bank N. A. in Strasburg, Pennsylvania.
2009-08-14 Acquired Dwelling House Savings And Loan Association in Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-08-21 Moved bank headquarters from Pittsburgh, Pennsylvania to Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-08-21 Acquired Pnc Bank, Delaware in Wilmington, Delaware.
2009-11-06 Acquired National City Bank in Cleveland, Ohio.
Total assets: $109,752,000
Total deposits: $90,468,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Peoples Bank of Maryland does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Peoples Bank of Maryland, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Peoples Bank of Maryland will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-16780