Georgia – Gwinnett – Norcross
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.piedmontbankonline.com
Georgia
Gwinnett
Norcross
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
58374
2006
FDIC Certificate Number: 58374
FDIC's unique number: 448818
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 3489035
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-09-01
2006-11-06 Institution established. Original name: Republic Bank Of Georgia.
2008-06-02 Moved bank headquarters from Suwanee, Georgia to Lawrenceville, Georgia.
2009-07-01 Changed name to The Piedmont Bank .
2010-08-25 Moved bank headquarters from Lawrenceville, Georgia to Norcross, Georgia.
Total assets: $342,633,000
Total deposits: $299,426,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $299,426,000
Equity capital: $42,569,000
Net income: $-70,000
Return on Assets: -0.04
Return on Equity: -0.33
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Piedmont Bancorp, Inc.
The Piedmont Bank - Lawrenceville Branch
The Piedmont Bank - Old Peachtree Road Office Branch
The Piedmont Bank - The Piedmont Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
The Piedmont Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Piedmont Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Piedmont Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-12667