Georgia – DeKalb – Atlanta
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
www.prudential.com
Georgia
DeKalb
Atlanta
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
16303
1945
FDIC Certificate Number: 16303
FDIC's unique number: 10491
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 443036
Report Date: 2004-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2004-04-19
1945-09-04 Institution established. Original name: Citizens' Bank Of Hapeville.
1972-11-16 Changed name to Capital City Bank .
1983-09-27 Changed name to The Prudential Bank And Trust Company .
1983-12-21 Moved bank headquarters from Hapeville, Georgia to Atlanta, Georgia.
2004-04-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Prudential Bank & Trust, FSB in Hartford, Connecticut.
2011-07-21 Changed primary regulatory agency from Federal Deposit Insurance Corporation to Comptroller Of The Currency.
Total assets: $108,468,000
Total deposits: $68,704,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Prudential Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Prudential Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Prudential Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-2293