Ohio – Clark – Springfield
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Ohio
Clark
Springfield
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
6655
1915
FDIC Certificate Number: 6655
FDIC's unique number: 4460
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Columbus
Federal Reserve ID Number: 429526
Report Date: 2008-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 6594
The date of the last data update: 2008-09-29
1915-06-05 Institution established. Original name: The Security National Bank.
1979-05-01 Changed name to The Security National Bank And Trust Co. .
1985-05-22 Reorganized.
1993-03-01 Acquired The Farmers And Traders Bank in Jamestown, Ohio.
2001-12-27 Acquired Third Savings And Loan Company in Piqua, Ohio.
2008-09-20 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Park National Bank in Newark, Ohio.
Total assets: $808,203,000
Total deposits: $567,532,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Security National Bank and Trust Co. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Security National Bank and Trust Co., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Security National Bank and Trust Co. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5956