Texas – Runnels – Winters
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.ssbwingate.com
Texas
Runnels
Winters
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
18677
1917
FDIC Certificate Number: 18677
FDIC's unique number: 12551
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 304762
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 2
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2006-05-22
1917-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Security State Bank.
2006-05-01 Moved bank headquarters from Wingate, Texas to Winters, Texas.
Total assets: $38,932,000
Total deposits: $35,387,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $35,387,000
Equity capital: $3,353,000
Net income: $195,000
Return on Assets: 1.08
Return on Equity: 12.01
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
The Security State Bank - The Security State Bank
The Security State Bank - The Security State Bank Buffalo Gap
No associations
LandOfFree
The Security State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Security State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Security State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4627