Colorado – Otero – La Junta
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.redibank.com
Colorado
Otero
La Junta
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
1778
1893
FDIC Certificate Number: 1778
FDIC's unique number: 1176
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Denver
Federal Reserve ID Number: 387055
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 4
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2011-08-30
1893-01-16 Institution established. Original name: The La Junta State Bank.
1985-04-09 Changed name to The La Junta State Bank & Trust Company .
1998-08-13 Changed name to The State Bank - La Junta .
2006-06-30 Changed name to The State Bank .
Total assets: $92,620,000
Total deposits: $76,544,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $76,544,000
Equity capital: $12,307,000
Net income: $199,000
Return on Assets: 0.43
Return on Equity: 3.27
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Ark Valley Bankshares, Inc.
The State Bank - Detached Facility
The State Bank - Drive-In Facility
The State Bank - Falcon Branch
The State Bank - The State Bank
The State Bank - The State Bank Branch
No associations
LandOfFree
The State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22731