Kansas – Haskell – Satanta
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kansas
Haskell
Satanta
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
16984
1950
FDIC Certificate Number: 16984
FDIC's unique number: 11058
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Hays
Federal Reserve ID Number: 415154
Report Date: 1994-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-06-28
1950-10-04 Institution established. Original name: The State Bank Of Satanta.
1994-06-10 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Haskell County State Bank in Sublette, Kansas.
1998-04-01 Acquired First State Bank in Greensburg, Kansas.
1999-04-01 Changed name to Centera Bank .
2005-11-19 Acquired The Peoples State Bank, Of Minneola, Kansas in Minneola, Kansas.
Total assets: $35,847,000
Total deposits: $28,801,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The State Bank of Satanta does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The State Bank of Satanta, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The State Bank of Satanta will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11517