Kansas – Woodson – Yates Center
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kansas
Woodson
Yates Center
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
8112
1909
FDIC Certificate Number: 8112
FDIC's unique number: 5163
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Wichita
Federal Reserve ID Number: 503752
Report Date: 1986-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1909-03-10 Institution established. Original name: The State Exchange Bank.
1986-08-14 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of The Girard National Bank in Girard, Kansas.
1995-01-03 Moved bank headquarters from Yates Center, Kansas to Girard, Kansas.
1995-01-03 Acquired The Bucklin State Bank in Bucklin, Kansas.
1995-01-03 Acquired The Farmers State Bank in Offerle, Kansas.
2002-02-01 Acquired Kansas State Bank in Holton, Kansas.
2006-09-01 Acquired Valley State Bank in Lamar, Colorado.
Total assets: $27,813,000
Total deposits: $26,692,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The State Exchange Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The State Exchange Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The State Exchange Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22124