Louisiana – Ouachita – Sterlington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Louisiana
Ouachita
Sterlington
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
16839
1949
FDIC Certificate Number: 16839
FDIC's unique number: 10938
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shreveport
Federal Reserve ID Number: 621759
Report Date: 1989-03-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1999-05-05
1949-09-01 Institution established. Original name: The Sterlington Bank.
1989-07-13 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Bank of St. Joseph & Trust Co. in Saint Joseph, Louisiana.
1989-10-16 Changed name to Cross Keys Bank .
Total assets: $15,243,000
Total deposits: $14,646,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Sterlington Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Sterlington Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Sterlington Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8729