West Virginia – Randolph – Harman
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
West Virginia
Randolph
Harman
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
9025
1905
FDIC Certificate Number: 9025
FDIC's unique number: 5766
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Scott Depot
Federal Reserve ID Number: 499127
Report Date: 2000-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 2000-08-02
1905-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Stockmans Bank Of Harman.
2000-07-27 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of The Grant County Bank in Petersburg, West Virginia.
2005-11-16 Acquired The National Bank Of Davis in Davis, West Virginia.
Total assets: $10,455,000
Total deposits: $8,670,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Stockmans Bank of Harman does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Stockmans Bank of Harman, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Stockmans Bank of Harman will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-23397