Pennsylvania – Schuylkill – Tremont
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Pennsylvania
Schuylkill
Tremont
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
7784
1902
FDIC Certificate Number: 7784
FDIC's unique number: 5019
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Harrisburg
Federal Reserve ID Number: 902216
Report Date: 1984-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 6165
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1902-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Tremont National Bank.
1985-02-04 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Upper Dauphin National Bank in Millersburg, Pennsylvania.
1988-12-30 Changed name to Community Banks, National Association .
1988-12-30 Moved bank headquarters from Tremont, Pennsylvania to Millersburg, Pennsylvania.
1988-12-30 Acquired Peoples Bank in Shamokin, Pennsylvania.
1988-12-30 Acquired Peoples Safe Deposit Bank, Saint Clair in Saint Clair, Pennsylvania.
1996-01-12 Acquired The Citizens' National Bank Of Ashland in Ashland, Pennsylvania.
2002-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community Banks in Millersburg, Pennsylvania.
2005-07-01 Acquired Blue Ball National Bank in Blue Ball, Pennsylvania.
2005-09-01 Changed name to Communitybanks .
2005-11-07 Acquired Pennrock Financial Advisors, National Association in Blue Ball, Pennsylvania.
2006-09-15 Acquired Sentry Trust Company in Chambersburg, Pennsylvania.
2007-04-01 Acquired East Prospect State Bank in East Prospect, Pennsylvania.
2007-04-01 Acquired Bucs Federal Bank in Owings Mills, Maryland.
2007-11-17 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Susquehanna Bank PA in Lititz, Pennsylvania.
2008-10-11 Changed name to Susquehanna Bank .
2008-10-11 Acquired Susquehanna Bank Dv in Bryn Mawr, Pennsylvania.
2008-10-11 Acquired Susquehanna Bank in Hagerstown, Maryland.
2011-10-01 Acquired Abington Savings Bank in Jenkintown, Pennsylvania.
Total assets: $6,498,000
Total deposits: $5,199,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Tremont National Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Tremont National Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Tremont National Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-5627