West Virginia – Tyler – Sistersville
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
West Virginia
Tyler
Sistersville
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
6743
1895
FDIC Certificate Number: 6743
FDIC's unique number: 4524
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Scott Depot
Federal Reserve ID Number: 671325
Report Date: 1983-12-31
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 5028
The date of the last data update: 1995-10-12
1895-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Union National Bank Of Sistersville.
1984-01-03 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Union Bank of Tyler County in Middlebourne, West Virginia.
1989-01-05 Reorganized.
1989-01-05 Changed name to Union Bank Of Tyler County, Inc. .
2002-03-01 Changed name to Union Bank, Inc. .
2007-09-15 Acquired The First National Bank Of St. Marys in St. Marys, West Virginia.
Total assets: $12,016,000
Total deposits: $10,259,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Union National Bank of Sistersville does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Union National Bank of Sistersville, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Union National Bank of Sistersville will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-24795