Texas – Runnels – Winters
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Texas
Runnels
Winters
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
12302
1906
FDIC Certificate Number: 12302
FDIC's unique number: 7821
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 563961
Report Date: 1994-09-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1994-11-29
1906-09-20 Institution established. Original name: The Winters State Bank.
1994-11-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of First State Bank, National Association in Abilene, Texas.
1996-01-01 Acquired Peoples National Bank in Winters, Texas.
1996-12-31 Acquired First State Bank, National Association in Odessa, Texas.
1997-01-27 Acquired Western National Bank in Lubbock, Texas.
1999-03-12 Acquired Azle State Bank in Azle, Texas.
2000-11-10 Acquired United Bank And Trust in Abilene, Texas.
2000-11-17 Changed name to State National Bank Of West Texas .
2001-03-09 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of State National Bank of West Texas in Lubbock, Texas.
2002-10-01 Changed name to State National Bank .
2003-02-14 Acquired State National Bank in El Paso, Texas.
2004-08-13 Acquired Mercantile Bank Texas in Fort Worth, Texas.
2005-09-26 Moved bank headquarters from Lubbock, Texas to Fort Worth, Texas.
2005-09-26 Reorganized.
2005-10-07 Acquired Heritage National Bank in Granbury, Texas.
2008-03-13 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Compass Bank in Birmingham, Alabama.
2009-08-21 Acquired Guaranty Bank in Austin, Texas as part of a government assisted transaction.
2009-09-11 Acquired Bbva Bancomer Usa in Diamond Bar, California.
2009-09-11 Acquired Central Bank Of The South in Anniston, Alabama.
Total assets: $15,050,000
Total deposits: $13,886,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Winters State Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Winters State Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Winters State Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-19318