Kentucky – Woodford – Versailles
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Kentucky
Woodford
Versailles
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
295
1852
FDIC Certificate Number: 295
FDIC's unique number: 238
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Lexington
Federal Reserve ID Number: 353416
Report Date: 1996-12-31
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1997-01-13
1852-03-01 Institution established. Original name: The Woodford Bank And Trust Company.
1987-04-01 Reorganized.
1997-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Community Trust Bank, National Association in Pikeville, Kentucky.
1998-12-31 Acquired Community Trust Bank Of West Virginia, National Association in Williamson, West Virginia.
2000-12-29 Acquired Community Trust Bank, Fsb in Campbellsville, Kentucky.
2001-01-26 Acquired The Bank Of Mt. Vernon in Richmond, Kentucky.
2002-03-18 Acquired Citizens National Bank & Trust Of Hazard in Hazard, Kentucky.
2003-01-01 Changed name to Community Trust Bank, Inc. .
2003-01-01 Changed institution class to Insured Commercial Banks, State, Members Frs.
2003-01-01 Changed primary regulatory agency from Comptroller Of The Currency to Federal Reserve Board.
2005-06-11 Acquired Heritage Community Bank in Danville, Kentucky.
2011-01-22 Acquired The First National Bank Of La Follette in La Follette, Tennessee.
Total assets: $101,544,000
Total deposits: $89,974,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
The Woodford Bank and Trust Company does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with The Woodford Bank and Trust Company, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and The Woodford Bank and Trust Company will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22493