Texas – Palo Pinto – Graford
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
www.titanbank.com
Texas
Palo Pinto
Graford
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
active
3225
1907
FDIC Certificate Number: 3225
FDIC's unique number: 2080
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Dallas
Federal Reserve ID Number: 328357
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 12437
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2009-10-05
1907-01-01 Institution established. Original name: First National Bank, Graford.
2009-07-20 Changed name to Titan Bank, N.A. .
2011-09-26 Moved bank headquarters from Graford, Texas to Mineral Wells, Texas.
Total assets: $49,259,000
Total deposits: $43,027,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $43,027,000
Equity capital: $5,531,000
Net income: $326,000
Return on Assets: 1.37
Return on Equity: 12.05
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Bmc Bancshares, Inc.
Titan Bank, N.A. - Graford P.K. Branch
Titan Bank, N.A. - Mineral Wells Branch
Titan Bank, N.A. - Titan Bank, N.A.
No associations
LandOfFree
Titan Bank, N.A. does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Titan Bank, N.A., we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Titan Bank, N.A. will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-22769