Tennessee – Tipton – Mason
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.trustcompanybanktn.com
Tennessee
Tipton
Mason
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
9956
1902
FDIC Certificate Number: 9956
FDIC's unique number: 6363
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Memphis
Federal Reserve ID Number: 450650
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-12-06
1902-01-01 Institution established. Original name: The Bank Of Mason.
2010-10-22 Changed name to Trust Company Bank .
Total assets: $34,713,000
Total deposits: $28,752,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $28,752,000
Equity capital: $5,018,000
Net income: $-305,000
Return on Assets: -1.85
Return on Equity: -12.6
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Heritage Bancorp, Inc.
Trust Company Bank - North Parkway Branch
Trust Company Bank - Old Highway 51 South Branch
Trust Company Bank - Trust Company Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
Trust Company Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Trust Company Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Trust Company Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17829