Georgia – Troup – Lagrange
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
Georgia
Troup
Lagrange
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
inactive
19576
1966
FDIC Certificate Number: 19576
FDIC's unique number: 13376
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 947338
Report Date: 1990-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
The date of the last data update: 1990-10-04
1966-04-11 Institution established. Original name: Peoples Bank Of La Grange.
1984-03-30 Changed name to Trust Company Of Troup County .
1990-08-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Trust Company Bank of Columbus, National Association in Columbus, Georgia.
1995-10-06 Changed name to Suntrust Bank, West Georgia, National Association .
2000-01-01 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of SunTrust Bank in Atlanta, Georgia.
2000-08-18 Moved bank headquarters from Columbus, Georgia to Atlanta, Georgia.
2003-06-02 Acquired Lighthouse Community Bank in Hilton Head Island, South Carolina.
2005-04-22 Acquired National Bank Of Commerce in Memphis, Tennessee.
2005-04-22 Acquired Nbc Bank, Fsb in Memphis, Tennessee.
2005-04-22 Acquired Suntrust Bankcard, National Association in Orlando, Florida.
2008-07-25 Acquired Gainesville Bank & Trust in Gainesville, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Community Trust Bank in Hiram, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired First National Bank Of The South in Milledgeville, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired United Bank & Trust Company in Rockmart, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Home Town Bank Of Villa Rica in Villa Rica, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired First National Bank Of Gwinnett in Duluth, Georgia.
2008-07-25 Acquired Mountain State Bank in Dawsonville, Georgia.
2008-08-01 Acquired First Priority Bank in Bradenton, Florida as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $62,106,000
Total deposits: $55,514,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Trust Company of Troup County does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Trust Company of Troup County, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Trust Company of Troup County will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-3297