Louisiana – Ouachita – West Monroe
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Louisiana
Ouachita
West Monroe
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
31527
1966
FDIC Certificate Number: 31527
FDIC's unique number: 44361
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shreveport
Federal Reserve ID Number: 428172
Report Date: 1987-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1990-01-01
1966-08-22 Institution established. Original name: Twin City Savings Bank, Fsb.
1985-07-31 Changed name to Twin City Fsb .
1987-08-31 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of Twin City Savings, A FSA in West Monroe, Louisiana.
1988-11-18 Failed. No active institution received any of its deposits or its assets.
Total assets: $188,380,000
Total deposits: $184,001,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Twin City FSB does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Twin City FSB, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Twin City FSB will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-11057