Louisiana – Ouachita – West Monroe
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
Louisiana
Ouachita
West Monroe
(SA) Savings associations, state or federal charter
inactive
32556
1987
FDIC Certificate Number: 32556
FDIC's unique number: 45390
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Shreveport
Federal Reserve ID Number: 428172
Report Date: 1988-09-30
Bank Charter Class: SA
The date of the last data update: 1998-12-10
1987-08-20 Institution established. Original name: Twin City Savings, A Fsa.
1987-08-31 Acquired Twin City Fsb in West Monroe, Louisiana.
1988-11-18 Failed. No active institution received any of its deposits or its assets.
Total assets: $72,059,000
Total deposits: $199,257,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
Twin City Savings, A FSA does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Twin City Savings, A FSA, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Twin City Savings, A FSA will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-4447