Tennessee – Fentress – Jamestown
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
www.myunionbankonline.com
Tennessee
Fentress
Jamestown
(NM) Commercial bank, state charter and Fed nonmember
active
6088
1904
FDIC Certificate Number: 6088
FDIC's unique number: 4111
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Knoxville
Federal Reserve ID Number: 235231
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: NM
Number of Domestic Offices: 3
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-12-07
1904-01-01 Institution established. Original name: Union Bank.
1985-03-30 Reorganized.
Total assets: $191,118,000
Total deposits: $167,794,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $167,794,000
Equity capital: $20,714,000
Net income: $576,000
Return on Assets: 0.62
Return on Equity: 5.67
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
Bank Holding Company: Jamestown Union Bancshares, Inc.
Union Bank - Clarkrange Branch
Union Bank - Union Bank
Union Bank - Union Bank
No associations
LandOfFree
Union Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with Union Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and Union Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-14503