Mississippi – Lowndes – Columbus
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
Mississippi
Lowndes
Columbus
(SM) Commercial bank, state charter & Fed member
inactive
5900
1902
FDIC Certificate Number: 5900
FDIC's unique number: 4022
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Jackson Ms
Federal Reserve ID Number: 674241
Report Date: 1993-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SM
The date of the last data update: 1993-08-05
1902-07-15 Institution established. Original name: Merchants & Farmers Bank.
1985-05-01 Acquired Tombigbee Bank & Trust Company in Fulton, Mississippi.
1986-02-18 Changed name to Unisouth Banking Corporation .
1993-07-31 Merged into and subsequently operated as part of Trustmark National Bank in Jackson, Mississippi.
1994-10-07 Acquired First National Bank Of Vicksburg in Vicksburg, Mississippi.
1997-02-28 Acquired National Bank Of Commerce Of Corinth in Corinth, Mississippi.
1997-09-19 Acquired Perry County Bank in New Augusta, Mississippi.
1998-03-14 Acquired Smith County Bank in Taylorsville, Mississippi.
2001-04-06 Acquired Peoples Bank in Barretville, Tennessee.
2001-12-14 Acquired Nashoba Bank in Germantown, Tennessee.
2003-08-22 Acquired Southern Community Bank, Atlantic in Destin, Florida.
2004-01-23 Acquired Plaza Bank in Houston, Texas.
2006-08-25 Acquired Republic National Bank in Houston, Texas.
2011-04-15 Acquired Heritage Banking Group in Carthage, Mississippi as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $173,683,000
Total deposits: $151,688,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
UniSouth Banking Corporation does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with UniSouth Banking Corporation, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and UniSouth Banking Corporation will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-8151