www.uasb.com
Pennsylvania
Allegheny
Pittsburgh
(SB) Savings banks, state charter
active
27033
1954
FDIC Certificate Number: 27033
FDIC's unique number: 38487
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Wexford
Federal Reserve ID Number: 218775
Report Date: 2011-06-30
Bank Charter Class: SB
Number of Domestic Offices: 1
Number of Foreign Offices: 0
The date of the last data update: 2010-08-03
1954-01-01 Institution established but was not FDIC insured. Original name: United-american Savings Bank.
1987-07-30 Became FDIC insured.
Total assets: $63,563,000
Total deposits: $53,655,000
Deposits held in domestic offices: $53,655,000
Equity capital: $6,114,000
Net income: $190,000
Return on Assets: 0.6
Return on Equity: 6.34
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No associations
LandOfFree
United-American Savings Bank does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with United-American Savings Bank, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and United-American Savings Bank will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17807