Georgia – Fulton – Atlanta
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
Georgia
Fulton
Atlanta
(N) Commercial bank, federal charter & Fed member
inactive
35065
1999
FDIC Certificate Number: 35065
FDIC's unique number: 74370
The FDIC Field Office where an institution is physically located: Atlanta
Federal Reserve ID Number: 2806112
Report Date: 2010-09-30
Bank Charter Class: N
OCC Charter Number: 23781
The date of the last data update: 2010-12-20
1999-09-20 Institution established. Original name: United Americas Bank, National Association.
2010-12-17 Merged with government financial assistance and subsequently operated as part of State Bank and Trust Company in Macon, Georgia.
2010-12-17 FDIC closing information for
United Americas Bank, National Association : http://www.fdic.gov/bank/individual/failed/unitedamericas.html.
2011-10-21 Acquired Community Capital Bank in Jonesboro, Georgia as part of a government assisted transaction.
Total assets: $242,339,000
Total deposits: $193,803,000
Last updated on: 2011-10-20
No affiliations
No associations
LandOfFree
United Americas Bank, National Association does not yet have a rating. At this time, there are no reviews or comments for this bank.
If you have personal experience with United Americas Bank, National Association, we encourage you to share that experience with our LandOfFree.com community. Your opinion is very important and United Americas Bank, National Association will most certainly appreciate the feedback.
Profile ID: LFUS-BAB-P-17799